Mallouh, Suzy Zahida (CPSO#: 73451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2310
Fax: (905) 883-2008
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. John's Rehabilitation Hospital
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-6780
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Mallouh’s medical record requests from the former Family Care Physicians Walk-in Cliniccan be obtained by writing to: Dr. E. Welchner, Medical Director 69 Wellington Street East Aurora, Ontario L4G 1H7 Tel: 905-503-8000 Fax: 905-503-8100
Date Received: 01 Aug 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZY ZAHIDA MALLOUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLOUH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001