Mallozzi, Angelina (CPSO#: 54514)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991