Malone, Dermot Edward Anthony John (CPSO#: 61608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St. Vincent's University Hospital
Elm Park
Nutley Lane
Dublin D04 T6F4
Ireland
Phone: +35312213895
Fax: +35312215012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DERMOT EDWARD ANTHONY JOHN MALONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1990