Malone, Robert Dale (CPSO#: 66673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 342-2262 Ext. 5546
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert D. Malone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malone ( CPSO# 66673 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
25 Front Avenue West
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone Number: (613) 342-2262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DALE MALONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998