Malone, Shawn Christopher (CPSO#: 60753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer Ctr
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina Ting Malone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ting Malone ( CPSO# 63531 )
Dr. S. Malone ( CPSO# 60753 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571


Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn C. Malone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN CHRISTOPHER MALONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1991