Malone, Steven Michael (CPSO#: 103222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2462 Howard Ave. Suite 128
Windsor, Ontario
Canada
Windsor ON  N8X3V6
Phone: 5199461201
Fax: 5199460253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Malone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malone ( CPSO# 103222)

Business Address:
Suite 128
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-1201

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN MICHAEL MALONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016