Malthaner, Richard Adam (CPSO#: 55697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Division Of Thoracic Surgery
E2 124
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6835
Fax: (519) 667 6517
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard A. Malthaner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malthaner ( CPSO# 55697 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room E2-124
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6835

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ADAM MALTHANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTHANER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1992