Maltman, Craig James (CPSO#: 58571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 748-2673
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG JAMES MALTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2012