Maltseva, Ekatherena Vladimirovna (CPSO#: 78083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Kharkov Institute of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A4
2 Champapgne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101-1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 3B9
Canada
Phone: 905-597-4457
Fax: 905-597-4458
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EKATHERENA VLADIMIROVNA MALTSEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTSEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004