Malus, Eli (CPSO#: 72348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Ext. 3671
Fax: (519) 973-4429
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELI MALUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003