Mambo, Nobby Chipo (CPSO#: 42321)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 31 Dec 1974
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1975 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 31 Dec 1976
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003