Mamelak, Adam Joseph (CPSO#: 88097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
12319 North Mopac Expressway
Austin TX  78758
United States
Phone: (512) 837-3376
Fax: (512) 837-3377
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Mamelak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2012

Medical Records Location

Address:  Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-(800) 775-0093.
Date Received: 29 Nov 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM JOSEPH MAMELAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMELAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008