Mamelak, Joshua David (CPSO#: 70373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Site
Department of Radiology
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32528
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Mamelak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mamelak ( CPSO# 70373 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre - Etobicoke General Si
Department of Radiology
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA DAVID MAMELAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMELAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2005