Mamen, Eleanor Anitra (CPSO#: 43066)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1993