Mammen, Thomas (CPSO#: 104622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Department of Radiology
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055214322 Ext. 46521
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Mammen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mammen ( CPSO# 104622)

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS MAMMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMMEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016