Mammoliti, Maryna (CPSO#: 92995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
AMG
Suite 234
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone: (519) 873-1615
Fax: (519) 873-1717
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH
250 College St.
Emergency Dept
Telemedicine
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Mammoliti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mammoliti ( CPSO# 92995 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
Unit 234
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 873-1615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYNA MAMMOLITI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMMOLITI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015