Man, Ada Wing Yan (CPSO#: 82808)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 28 Jan 2011
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2011