Man, Hon-Sum Jeffrey (CPSO#: 77824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Adult Respirology
11PMB 120
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3096
Fax: 416-340-3170
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 11 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HON-SUM JEFFREY MAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008