Man, Kwok-Chu (CPSO#: 55608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106 Mary Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2P2
Phone: (905) 430-6795
Fax: (905) 430-7514
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-5666
Fax: (416) 292-6733
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kwok Chu Man Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Man ( CPSO# 55608 )

Business Address:
106 Mary Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2P2
Phone Number: (905) 430-6795

Business Address:
405 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 292-5666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWOK-CHU MAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1986