Man, Thomas Mink-Kay (CPSO#: 94007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Toronto CHC
168 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5V 2R4
Phone: (416)703 8480
Fax: (416) 703 8479
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: (416) 640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS MINK-KAY MAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012