Man-Son-Hing, Malcolm Gregory (CPSO#: 59985)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013