Manace, Edward David (CPSO#: 22937)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 19 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1964 to 17 Jun 1965
Other - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1995