Manassis, Katharina Marie (CPSO#: 56828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
471 Rougemount Drive
Pickering ON  L1W 2B8
Phone: (905) 509-5155
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Manassis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Manassis ( CPSO# 56828 )

Business Address:
471 Rougemount Drive
Pickering ON  L1W 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 509-5155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHARINA MARIE MANASSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANASSIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1987