Manawadu, Gnanindra Nandana (CPSO#: 79710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone: (905) 785-3627
Fax: (905) 785-3628
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dundurn Medical Centre
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Canada
Phone: 905-529-4040
Fax: 905-529-4494
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gnanindra Manawadu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Manawadu ( CPSO# 79710 )

Business Address:
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 785-3627

Business Address:
Dundurn Medical Centre
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GNANINDRA NANDANA MANAWADU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANAWADU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005