Manax, Stanley Joseph (CPSO#: 19560)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 17 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Mar 2014