Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Manchanda, Meera (CPSO#: 60068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: (519) 439-1431
Fax: (519) 672-7888
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meera Manchanda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Manchanda ( CPSO# 60068 )
Dr. R. Manchanda ( CPSO# 54947 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 439-1431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA MANCHANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANCHANDA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992