Manchester, William Douglas (CPSO#: 24579)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1987