Manchuk, Derek Russel (CPSO#: 69208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4722
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manchuk Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Manchuk ( CPSO# 69208 )
Dr. T. Henry ( CPSO# 69136 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK RUSSEL MANCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANCHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jan 1998 to 01 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1997