Mand, Gurpreet Toor (CPSO#: 83962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:J. J. M. Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURPREET TOOR MAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 05 Apr 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2007 to 16 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008