Mandalfino, Patricia (CPSO#: 65176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
723 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E3
Phone: (519) 745-2366
Fax: (519) 745-9035
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saunders and Mandalfino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saunders ( CPSO# 65189 )
Dr. P. Mandalfino ( CPSO# 65176 )

Business Address:
723 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E3
Phone Number: (519) 745-2366

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MANDALFINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDALFINO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993