Mandel, Howard Elliot (CPSO#: 27426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 532-1939
Fax: (416) 532-4860
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mandel ( CPSO# 27426 )

Business Address:
305 - 27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 532-1939

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 7, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.Howard Elliot Mandel,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mandel to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. HOWARD ELLIOT MANDEL
                                            ("Dr. Mandel")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Mandel, certificate of registration number 27426, am a member of
                  the College.  Further to a reassessment of my practice, the College has
                  received information regarding my standard of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (4)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake that I will:
                  
                        (i)   restrict my practice to a maximum of 5 patient encounters per
                              hour, up to a maximum of 40 patient encounters per day.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan 
                              ("IEP") attached as Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the
                               recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the assessor, dated March 9, 2016, and concerns that
                        may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Mandel, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Mandel, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Medical record-keeping; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it.  I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of executing this undertaking or, if no satisfactory
                        program is available by that time, by the first possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mandel, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Mandel, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  (ii)any
                              recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee
                              has identified in its decision referenced in section (8)(d)
                              as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mandel, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Mandel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 





            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Mandel, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Pursuant to a reassessment, the College received information
                              regarding Dr. Mandel's standard of practice.  As a result,
                              Dr. Mandel voluntarily restricts his practice to a maximum of
                              5 patient encounters per hour, up to a maximum of 40 patient
                              encounters per day.
                  
                              Dr. Mandel must also:
                  
                                    "practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                                    acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                                    "engage in professional education in medical
                                    record-keeping.
                  
                                    "have his practice reassessed by an assessor selected
                                    by the College within 6 months of the end of the period
                                    of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Mandel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Howard Elliot Mandel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 7, 2017:

Pursuant to a reassessment, the College received information regarding Dr. Mandel's standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Mandel voluntarily restricts his practice to a maximum of 5 patient encounters per hour, up to a maximum of 40 patient encounters per day.

Dr. Mandel must also:

practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.

have his practice reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.