Mandel, Lisa Francine (CPSO#: 62513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone: (905) 881-3984
Fax: (905) 881-3198
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Alter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Alter ( CPSO# 62441 )
Dr. L. Mandel ( CPSO# 62513 )

Business Address:
311 Commercial Street
Suite 109
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 878-9805

Business Address:
Heartwise Diagnostics
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0422

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 480-5838

Business Address:
Heartwise Diagnostics
100 - 12 Morgan Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 1R1
Phone Number: (905) 695-5665

Business Address:
347 Ramsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R7
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA FRANCINE MANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991