Mandel, Scott Joseph (CPSO#: 65311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact Dr. Mandel at Suite 2600, 72 Washington Street, Taunton, MA, United States, 02780, Tel: 508-824-1824.
Date Received: 05 Oct 2017


Address: 110 Liberty Street Brockton, MA 02301 Telephone: 508-565-3055 Fax: 508-894-0757
Date Received: 17 Apr 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT JOSEPH MANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993