Mandhane, Piushkumar Jaman (CPSO#: 73343)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 May 1999 to 04 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2007