Mandilaras, Victoria Aspasia (CPSO#: 104904)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017