Mandzia, Jennifer Lee (CPSO#: 86763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Room A10 306
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2944
Fax: (519) 663-3411
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEE MANDZIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDZIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 2009 to 15 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 2010 to 15 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013