Mang, Fan-Hsia (CPSO#: 78145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology, M1-700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4905
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAN-HSIA MANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2004