Manganas, Athena (CPSO#: 79766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CLSC St Laurent
1055 Avenue Ste Croix
Montreal QC  H4L 3Z2
Phone: (514) 748-6381 Ext. 73725

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATHENA MANGANAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGANAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2015