Mangat, Amardeep Singh (CPSO#: 96868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Touro University California (TUCOM), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amardeep Singh Mangat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mangat ( CPSO# 96868 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Amardeep  Singh  Mangat  may  practise  medicine independently in internal
            medicine, only.