Mangat, Dilpriya Kaur (CPSO#: 101812)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University Of Antigua, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2015