Mangat, Iqwal Singh (CPSO#: 66469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 6-050 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5152
Fax: (416) 864-5348
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Heart Centre
2300 Yonge Street, Suit 906
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Iqwal Mangat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mangat ( CPSO# 66469 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Room 6-050 Donnelly
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5104

Business Address:
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 721-1999

Business Address:
906 - 2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4B 1E4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IQWAL SINGH MANGAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997