Mangatal, Moira Catherine (CPSO#: 77784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Furlong, Moira Catherine (used until: 22 Jul 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201 - 1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1223
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mangatal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mangatal ( CPSO# 77784 )

Business Address:
201 - 1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOIRA CATHERINE MANGATAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGATAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004