Mangel, Joy Elise (CPSO#: 70709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8479
Fax: (519) 685-8477
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mangel Stein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stein ( CPSO# 74806 )
Dr. J. Mangel ( CPSO# 70709 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8139

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOY ELISE MANGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANGEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 1996 to 25 Aug 1996
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000