Maniate, Jerry Mathew (CPSO#: 79572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road, Admin Room O
Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899 Ext. 78459
Fax: (613) 739-6267
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Maniate Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maniate ( CPSO# 79572 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Admin Room
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY MATHEW MANIATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIATE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006