Manigat, Claude Charles (CPSO#: 28892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
610 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M1
Phone: (613) 938-6986
Fax: (613) 938-8163
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claude Manigat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Manigat ( CPSO# 28892 )

Business Address:
610 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M1
Phone Number: (613) 938-6986

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDE CHARLES MANIGAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIGAT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1976