Manis, Adam (CPSO#: 104261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Devonshire Pl,
Toronto, ON M5S 2C9
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Phone: (416) 978-4678
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Manis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manis ( CPSO# 104261)

Business Address:
100 Devonshire Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Phone Number: (416) 978-4678

Business Address:
151 - 171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 588-5880

Business Address:
1175 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1J4

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5

Business Address:
120 Dorothy Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1P0

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0

Business Address:
39 2nd Street Southeast
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 363-2340

Business Address:
4 - 8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Business Address:
108 - 130 Adelaide Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 479-8554

Business Address:
151 - 171 East Liberty
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 588-5880

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM MANIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014