Manji, Shairoz Shelina (CPSO#: 78684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Five Counties Children's Centre
872 Dutton Road
Peterborough ON  K9H 7G1
Phone: (705) 748-2221
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Manji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manji ( CPSO# 78684 )

Business Address:
Five Counties Children's Centre
872 Dutton Road
Peterborough ON  K9H 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 748-2221

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAIROZ SHELINA MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017