Mankoo, Ravinder Singh (CPSO#: 87886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Grace University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
International Sleep Clinic
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 3306
Fax: (705) 773-4987
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sleep And Alertness Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 800
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 837-8181
Fax: (647) 427-4928
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.S.Mankoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mankoo ( CPSO# 87886 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
International Sleep Clinic
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Business Address:
Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 837-8181

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH MANKOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANKOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 18 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 19 Feb 2010 to 19 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2012 to 19 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014