Mann, Catherine Dorothy (CPSO#: 70376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: Mann-Hamilton, Catherine Dorothy (used until: 08 Aug 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
The Ottawa Hospital - Gen Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE DOROTHY MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 28 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 29 Mar 2000 to 15 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2001 to 30 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002