Mann, George Richard (CPSO#: 33586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Supervising Coroner
West Region - London
Suite 303
235 North Centre Road
London ON  N5X 4E7
Phone: (519) 661-6624 Ext. 205
Fax: (519) 661-6617
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Rick Mann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2009

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Kincardine Community Medical Clinic 44 Queen Street Kincardine, Ontario N2Z 3C1
Date Received: 31 Mar 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE RICHARD MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1982